U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-30100-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Burnette
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 28, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • June 28, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • June 17, 2021: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • June 17, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • June 09, 2021: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 25, 2021: [Report and Recommendations]
  • May 25, 2021: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 25, 2021: [Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 25, 2021: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • May 25, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 13, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
December, 2020
  • December 31, 2020: [Letter]
  • December 28, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 23, 2020: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • December 22, 2020: [Text Order on Oral Motion for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing]
  • December 22, 2020: [Oral Motion for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 22, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 22, 2020: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 22, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
September, 2020
  • September 15, 2020: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • August 31, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • August 31, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 19, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • August 19, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • August 12, 2020: [Letter]
  • August 05, 2020: [Allocution Statement (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 04, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • August 03, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
July, 2020
  • July 09, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 01, 2020: [Report and Recommendations]
  • July 01, 2020: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 01, 2020: [Text Order of Detention]
  • July 01, 2020: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • July 01, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 01, 2020: [Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
June, 2020
  • June 17, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 17, 2020: [Text Order on Oral Motion for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing]
  • June 17, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • June 17, 2020: [Oral Motion for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 17, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • June 17, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 17, 2020: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
September, 2018
  • September 06, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • September 06, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • September 06, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 04, 2018: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • September 04, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
August, 2018
  • August 23, 2018: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • August 21, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 10, 2018: [Report and Recommendations]
  • August 10, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • August 10, 2018: [Order]
  • August 09, 2018: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • August 09, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 07, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
July, 2018
  • July 26, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 26, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • July 26, 2018: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 26, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • July 26, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 26, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • July 26, 2018: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • July 26, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 26, 2018: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • July 26, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • July 26, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2018
  • March 20, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • March 20, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 20, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • March 20, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • March 19, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • March 19, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 12, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • March 12, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • March 12, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
February, 2018
  • February 27, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • February 21, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • February 13, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
December, 2017
  • December 29, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 19, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 18, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • December 18, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • December 18, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 15, 2017: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • December 12, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Superseding - Redacted]
  • December 12, 2017: [Indictment - Superseding]
October, 2017
  • October 24, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 23, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • October 23, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 23, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2017
  • September 27, 2017: [Order]
  • September 26, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • September 25, 2017: [Request]
  • September 25, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • September 18, 2017: [Request]
  • September 18, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 18, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • September 18, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 18, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 18, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 18, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 18, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • September 18, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 18, 2017: [Case Unsealed]
  • September 18, 2017: [Arrest]
  • September 18, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 18, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 18, 2017: [Bail Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.