U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-50154-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Knutson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 05, 2021: [Passport - Return of]
  • March 05, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • March 02, 2021: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
December, 2020
  • December 07, 2020: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • December 03, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
November, 2020
  • November 23, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 20, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2020
  • July 31, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 27, 2020: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • July 27, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2020
  • April 09, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 01, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2019
  • December 16, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 05, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • December 05, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2019
  • August 20, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 06, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • August 06, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2019
  • April 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
March, 2019
  • March 28, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 28, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
January, 2019
  • January 02, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
December, 2018
  • December 10, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • December 10, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2018
  • August 15, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 08, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • August 08, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2018
  • April 27, 2018: [Consent]
  • April 25, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 18, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 18, 2018: [Continue]
February, 2018
  • February 05, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
January, 2018
  • January 30, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2017
  • November 20, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • November 16, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 14, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • November 09, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2017
  • October 12, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 04, 2017: [Passport - Receipt of]
  • October 02, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 02, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 29, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 29, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • September 29, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 29, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • September 29, 2017: [Arrest]
  • September 29, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 19, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • September 19, 2017: [Indictment]
  • September 19, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.