U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-50145-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Kindle
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2020
  • January 08, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
October, 2018
  • October 11, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 11, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • October 09, 2018: [Receipt for Payment]
  • October 09, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • October 08, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
September, 2018
  • September 12, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 12, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • September 12, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
August, 2018
  • August 17, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • August 02, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
June, 2018
  • June 11, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
May, 2018
  • May 29, 2018: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • May 29, 2018: [Consent]
  • May 29, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 14, 2018: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • May 14, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 14, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • May 14, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 08, 2018: [Joint Notice of Speedy Trial Calculation]
  • May 04, 2018: [In Limine]
  • May 04, 2018: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
April, 2018
  • April 11, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 11, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • April 11, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2018
  • March 14, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 09, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2017
  • December 18, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 15, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • December 15, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2017
  • November 29, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 22, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 22, 2017: [Terminate Hearings]
October, 2017
  • October 27, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 25, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • October 24, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 03, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • October 03, 2017: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • October 02, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • October 02, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • October 02, 2017: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • October 02, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 02, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 02, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 02, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • October 02, 2017: [Bail Report]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • September 29, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 29, 2017: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • September 27, 2017: [Information - Pursuant to 21 U.S.C. 851]
  • September 27, 2017: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • September 19, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • September 19, 2017: [Indictment]
  • September 19, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.