U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-50146-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Perry
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
December, 2019
  • December 09, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • December 06, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • December 06, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
November, 2019
  • November 21, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
July, 2019
  • July 12, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • July 08, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • July 08, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 08, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
May, 2019
  • May 23, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • May 10, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • May 10, 2019: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
April, 2019
  • April 05, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
March, 2019
  • March 15, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • March 15, 2019: [Consent]
  • March 15, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
February, 2019
  • February 26, 2019: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • February 26, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • February 26, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • February 26, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
January, 2019
  • January 30, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 25, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2018
  • October 04, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 04, 2018: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • October 04, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2018
  • August 07, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 07, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2018
  • June 12, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 06, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2018
  • April 19, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 19, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 19, 2018: [Terminate Hearings]
February, 2018
  • February 13, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 07, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2017
  • October 20, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 19, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • October 19, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 12, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 12, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • October 12, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • October 10, 2017: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 06, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • October 04, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • October 04, 2017: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • October 04, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 04, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • October 04, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 04, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 04, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • October 03, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • October 03, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 03, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • September 27, 2017: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • September 19, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • September 19, 2017: [Indictment]
  • September 19, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.