U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-30122-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gillette
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 01, 2022: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 26, 2022: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
January, 2020
  • January 29, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • January 16, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • January 15, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • January 06, 2020: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • January 06, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • January 02, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • January 02, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
December, 2019
  • December 27, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • December 18, 2019: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • December 10, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 05, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
  • December 05, 2019: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • December 05, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • December 05, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 05, 2019: [Text Order Holding Defendant to Answer Revocation Petition]
  • December 05, 2019: [Text Order of Detention]
  • December 05, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 05, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • December 05, 2019: [Invocation of Rights]
  • December 04, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • December 03, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 03, 2019: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
May, 2019
  • May 02, 2019: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • May 01, 2019: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
September, 2018
  • September 25, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 25, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • September 24, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • September 24, 2018: [Receipt for Payment]
  • September 19, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • September 19, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 18, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 17, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • September 17, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • September 17, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 05, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
August, 2018
  • August 24, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
July, 2018
  • July 11, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 11, 2018: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • July 11, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 10, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 10, 2018: [Information - Felony]
  • July 09, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 09, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 09, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 23, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 23, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2018
  • March 29, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 28, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 28, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 23, 2018: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • March 23, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • March 08, 2018: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
February, 2018
  • February 08, 2018: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
January, 2018
  • January 29, 2018: [Report and Recommendations]
  • January 29, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • January 29, 2018: [Transcript]
  • January 25, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 19, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 19, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 19, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • January 19, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 16, 2018: [Response]
  • January 09, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 09, 2018: [Suppress]
  • January 08, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 08, 2018: [Suppress]
December, 2017
  • December 19, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 12, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 12, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2017
  • November 08, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 07, 2017: [Sealed Evaluation]
October, 2017
  • October 18, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 12, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 12, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • October 12, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2017
  • September 27, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 26, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 26, 2017: [Request]
  • September 25, 2017: [Order]
  • September 25, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • September 22, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • September 19, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 19, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 19, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 19, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 19, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 19, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • September 19, 2017: [Case Unsealed]
  • September 19, 2017: [Arrest]
  • September 19, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 19, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • September 19, 2017: [Request]
  • September 19, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 18, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.