U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-50149-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Pastian et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • May 12, 2025: [Transfer Out/Supervised Release]
April, 2019
  • April 08, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
February, 2019
  • February 26, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 26, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • February 25, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • February 19, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • February 19, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • February 19, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • February 08, 2019: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
January, 2019
  • January 22, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • January 11, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
December, 2018
  • December 11, 2018: [Text Scheduling Order]
November, 2018
  • November 26, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • November 16, 2018: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • November 16, 2018: [Consent]
  • November 16, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
October, 2018
  • October 30, 2018: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • October 30, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • October 30, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • October 30, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 17, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • October 05, 2018: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • October 04, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 04, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • October 03, 2018: [Sentencing]
September, 2018
  • September 26, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • September 26, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 26, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
August, 2018
  • August 24, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • August 20, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • August 13, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • August 10, 2018: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 24, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 19, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 19, 2018: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • July 17, 2018: [Order Referring Motion]
  • July 17, 2018: [Furlough]
June, 2018
  • June 27, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • June 25, 2018: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • June 25, 2018: [Consent]
  • June 25, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 05, 2018: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • June 04, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • June 04, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • June 04, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
May, 2018
  • May 15, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 08, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 07, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 07, 2018: [Request]
February, 2018
  • February 03, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • February 02, 2018: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • February 02, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 30, 2018: [Release from Custody]
  • January 23, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 22, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2017
  • November 15, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • November 03, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
October, 2017
  • October 26, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • October 25, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 23, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • October 17, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 05, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 04, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • October 04, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • October 04, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 04, 2017: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • October 04, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 04, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 04, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • October 04, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • October 03, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • October 03, 2017: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • October 02, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 02, 2017: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • September 29, 2017: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • September 29, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 29, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • September 29, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 29, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • September 29, 2017: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • September 28, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 25, 2017: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • September 25, 2017: [Arrest - Other District]
  • September 19, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • September 19, 2017: [Indictment]
  • September 19, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.