U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-50152-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Deal et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 15, 2021: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • April 15, 2021: [Transfer Out/Supervised Release]
August, 2018
  • August 29, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • August 15, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • August 15, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • August 15, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • August 08, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • August 08, 2018: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • August 06, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 06, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • August 06, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
July, 2018
  • July 18, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • July 18, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 17, 2018: [Pre-Sentence Payment]
  • July 17, 2018: [Receipt for Payment]
  • July 17, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • July 12, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • July 10, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • July 10, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 10, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
June, 2018
  • June 21, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • June 18, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • June 11, 2018: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • June 06, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
May, 2018
  • May 24, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • May 01, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
April, 2018
  • April 27, 2018: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • April 27, 2018: [Consent]
  • April 27, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 24, 2018: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • April 12, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • April 12, 2018: [Bond Hearing]
  • April 11, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • April 03, 2018: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: [Consent]
  • March 30, 2018: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • March 30, 2018: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • March 30, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 16, 2018: [Terminate Hearings]
  • March 13, 2018: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • March 09, 2018: [Sealed Order]
  • March 08, 2018: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • March 07, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 05, 2018: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • March 05, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 05, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 05, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • March 02, 2018: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • March 02, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 02, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 02, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
February, 2018
  • February 01, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
January, 2018
  • January 24, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 24, 2018: [Continue]
  • January 17, 2018: [Order on Ex Parte Motion for Revocation]
  • January 17, 2018: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • January 11, 2018: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • January 08, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 08, 2018: [Arrest]
  • January 05, 2018: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
November, 2017
  • November 29, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • November 15, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 08, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 08, 2017: [Continue]
  • November 01, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
October, 2017
  • October 30, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • October 25, 2017: [Request]
  • October 20, 2017: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • October 20, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 20, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 20, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • October 20, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 20, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • October 20, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 18, 2017: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • October 12, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • October 11, 2017: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • October 11, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 11, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 11, 2017: [Arrest - Other District]
  • October 04, 2017: [Request]
  • October 04, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 04, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • October 04, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • October 04, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 04, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 04, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 04, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • October 04, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 03, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • October 03, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • October 03, 2017: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • October 02, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • September 26, 2017: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • September 19, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • September 19, 2017: [Indictment]
  • September 19, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.