U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-50151-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bagneschi
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • May 01, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • May 01, 2025: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
August, 2018
  • August 14, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • August 14, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • August 13, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • August 03, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 03, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • August 03, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
July, 2018
  • July 02, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
June, 2018
  • June 22, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • June 14, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
May, 2018
  • May 22, 2018: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • May 16, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • May 04, 2018: [Consent]
  • May 04, 2018: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • May 04, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
April, 2018
  • April 20, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 19, 2018: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • April 19, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 19, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • April 19, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • February 27, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 26, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2018
  • January 30, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 26, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 19, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2017
  • December 01, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • November 30, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 17, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 10, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2017
  • September 28, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • September 28, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • September 27, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
  • September 25, 2017: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • September 19, 2017: [Text Order]
  • September 19, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • September 19, 2017: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.