U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-50156-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Corral-Duenas
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2018
  • January 16, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • January 16, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 12, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • January 05, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • January 05, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • January 05, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
December, 2017
  • December 12, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • December 08, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • December 05, 2017: [Text Scheduling Order]
November, 2017
  • November 07, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • November 03, 2017: [Consent]
  • November 03, 2017: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • November 03, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
October, 2017
  • October 26, 2017: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • October 26, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • October 26, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • October 26, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 03, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • October 02, 2017: [Order of Detention]
September, 2017
  • September 28, 2017: [Terminate Hearings]
  • September 27, 2017: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • September 26, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 19, 2017: [Text Order]
  • September 19, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • September 19, 2017: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.