U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-50150-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Left Hand Bull
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2020
  • February 20, 2020: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
January, 2020
  • January 14, 2020: [Order for Disposition of Exhibits]
January, 2018
  • January 12, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
December, 2017
  • December 14, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • December 14, 2017: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • December 07, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 01, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2017
  • November 17, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • November 13, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 02, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2017
  • October 25, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • October 17, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 13, 2017: [1 - Ex Parte Document]
  • October 13, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 13, 2017: [Reconsideration]
  • October 04, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • October 04, 2017: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • October 04, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 03, 2017: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • October 03, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
September, 2017
  • September 26, 2017: [Reconsideration]
  • September 26, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 25, 2017: [Request]
  • September 25, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 22, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • September 22, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • September 22, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 22, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 22, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 22, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 22, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • September 22, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • September 22, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 19, 2017: [Arrest]
  • September 19, 2017: [Warrant Issued]
  • September 19, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • September 19, 2017: [Indictment]
  • September 19, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.