U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cv-04129
  • Case Name: Van Donslear v. Wiles et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 30, 2020: [Judgment]
  • December 30, 2020: [Stipulation of Dismissal (attorney use)]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • November 30, 2020: [Extend]
September, 2020
  • September 01, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: [Extend]
July, 2020
  • July 07, 2020: [~Util - Case Stayed]
  • July 07, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • July 07, 2020: [Extend]
April, 2020
  • April 20, 2020: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • April 20, 2020: [Stay]
  • April 03, 2020: [Notice]
March, 2020
  • March 19, 2020: [Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney]
  • March 17, 2020: [Order on Motion for Sanctions]
  • March 17, 2020: [Proposed Order]
  • March 16, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 16, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 16, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 05, 2020: [Letter]
  • March 05, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
February, 2020
  • February 21, 2020: [Reply]
  • February 10, 2020: [Response to Motion]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • January 30, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • January 10, 2020: [Supplement]
  • January 10, 2020: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • January 10, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 10, 2020: [Sanctions]
December, 2019
  • December 16, 2019: [Amended Complaint]
  • December 03, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 02, 2019: [Status Conference]
November, 2019
  • November 18, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • November 18, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 17, 2019: [Continue]
  • November 11, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • November 07, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 07, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 06, 2019: [Continue]
October, 2019
  • October 24, 2019: [Settlement Conference]
  • October 01, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
September, 2019
  • September 09, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 09, 2019: [Letter Received]
  • September 06, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
August, 2019
  • August 29, 2019: [Letter]
  • August 07, 2019: [Order]
June, 2019
  • June 04, 2019: [Order on Motion to Compel]
April, 2019
  • April 12, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 09, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • April 09, 2019: [Consent]
  • April 09, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • March 29, 2019: [Extend Deadlines]
  • March 19, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 19, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 14, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
  • March 14, 2019: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • March 14, 2019: [Certificate]
  • March 14, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 14, 2019: [Compel]
January, 2019
  • January 23, 2019: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • January 17, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 17, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 17, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 02, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • January 02, 2019: [Counterclaim]
December, 2018
  • December 06, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
August, 2018
  • August 17, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • August 16, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • August 16, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 15, 2018: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • August 15, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
  • August 15, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
April, 2018
  • April 27, 2018: [Rule 26 Disclosures]
  • April 02, 2018: [Rule 26 Disclosures]
February, 2018
  • February 26, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 26, 2018: [Discovery Report]
December, 2017
  • December 21, 2017: [Order for Discovery Report]
  • December 21, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 21, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • December 21, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
November, 2017
  • November 22, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • November 07, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 07, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
September, 2017
  • September 22, 2017: [Filing Fee Received]
  • September 22, 2017: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • September 22, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • September 22, 2017: [Complaint (COURT USE ONLY)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.