U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-30032
  • Case Name: Kimberly Kay Washechek
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2018
  • May 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Closing Case]
April, 2018
  • April 13, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
December, 2017
  • December 29, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 27, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Discharging Debtor(s)]
  • December 21, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 19, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Turnover of Property from Debtor]
  • December 14, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 12, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Objection to Debtor(s) Claim of Exemptions]
  • December 06, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Turnover of Property from Debtor]
  • December 02, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Employment of Attorney (Text Order)]
  • November 30, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • November 22, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Objection to Debtor(s) Claim of Exemptions]
  • November 22, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Employment of Attorney]
October, 2017
  • October 27, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
  • October 16, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certification of Financial Management Course]
September, 2017
  • September 24, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • September 22, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • September 22, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Intention]
  • September 22, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Employee Income Records]
  • September 22, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • September 22, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • September 22, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • September 22, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Add Trustee]
  • September 22, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.