U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:07-cr-10020-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Archambault
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 10, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • June 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • June 01, 2021: [Response to Motion]
May, 2021
  • May 29, 2021: [Extend]
  • May 24, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • May 24, 2021: [Extend]
  • May 22, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • May 13, 2021: [Transcript]
  • May 12, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • May 10, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • May 05, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
April, 2021
  • April 27, 2021: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • April 27, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • April 26, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 26, 2021: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • April 26, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • April 26, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 26, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • April 26, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • April 26, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • April 05, 2021: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • April 05, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 05, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 05, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
March, 2020
  • March 06, 2020: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
July, 2019
  • July 02, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • July 02, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • July 02, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
June, 2019
  • June 27, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 26, 2019: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • June 26, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • June 03, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • June 03, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • June 03, 2019: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
May, 2019
  • May 01, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 01, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
  • April 30, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • April 30, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 30, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 30, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • April 30, 2019: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • April 25, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 24, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
January, 2018
  • January 09, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
December, 2017
  • December 05, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • December 04, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • December 04, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
November, 2017
  • November 22, 2017: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • November 22, 2017: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • November 14, 2017: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • November 06, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 03, 2017: [Report and Recommendations]
  • November 03, 2017: [Order of Detention]
October, 2017
  • October 27, 2017: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 29, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • September 29, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 28, 2017: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 27, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • September 27, 2017: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • September 27, 2017: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • September 26, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 26, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 26, 2017: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • September 26, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.