U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-30121-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jones
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2020
  • September 03, 2020: [Notice of Expiration of Probation]
October, 2018
  • October 18, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
September, 2018
  • September 07, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • September 06, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 06, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • September 04, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • September 04, 2018: [Receipt for Payment]
August, 2018
  • August 20, 2018: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • August 10, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 07, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error - Probation]
  • August 07, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 07, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • August 07, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • August 06, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
July, 2018
  • July 24, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • July 10, 2018: [Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • July 10, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
May, 2018
  • May 30, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 30, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 30, 2018: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • May 30, 2018: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • May 24, 2018: [Information - Misdemeanor - Superseding]
  • May 17, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 15, 2018: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 15, 2018: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • May 09, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 09, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 09, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
March, 2018
  • March 26, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 15, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • March 15, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2018
  • January 25, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 19, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • January 19, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2017
  • November 16, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 09, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • November 09, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2017
  • October 18, 2017: [Order]
  • October 16, 2017: [Stipulation]
September, 2017
  • September 28, 2017: [Response]
  • September 27, 2017: [Request]
  • September 27, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • September 26, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 26, 2017: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • September 26, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 26, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 26, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 26, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • September 26, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 26, 2017: [Case Unsealed]
  • September 26, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 26, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 26, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • September 26, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.