U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-30120-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Halligan
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2019
  • October 03, 2019: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
August, 2019
  • August 12, 2019: [Notice of Expiration of Probation]
October, 2018
  • October 29, 2018: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 25, 2018: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
February, 2018
  • February 15, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • February 14, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 14, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • February 13, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • February 13, 2018: [Receipt for Payment]
January, 2018
  • January 11, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 10, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • January 10, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • January 10, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
December, 2017
  • December 08, 2017: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • December 05, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 01, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
November, 2017
  • November 29, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • November 22, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 22, 2017: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • November 22, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • November 09, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
September, 2017
  • September 28, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 26, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 26, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release (RESTRICTED)]
  • September 26, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 26, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 26, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 26, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 26, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • September 26, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 26, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • September 26, 2017: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • September 26, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 26, 2017: [Case Unsealed]
  • September 26, 2017: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • September 26, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 26, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 26, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • September 26, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.