U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:12-cr-50175-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gallego
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2020
  • January 24, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • January 23, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • January 14, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
December, 2019
  • December 27, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 20, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • December 20, 2019: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • December 20, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • December 20, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 20, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • December 20, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • December 20, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
October, 2019
  • October 07, 2019: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 07, 2019: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
September, 2019
  • September 23, 2019: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • September 20, 2019: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
July, 2019
  • July 09, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
June, 2019
  • June 24, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • June 19, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • June 18, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • June 17, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 14, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • June 14, 2019: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • June 14, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 14, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 14, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • June 14, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • June 14, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
November, 2018
  • November 02, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • November 01, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
October, 2018
  • October 19, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • October 18, 2018: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 16, 2018: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • October 16, 2018: [Order Reassigning Case]
July, 2018
  • July 25, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 25, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • July 24, 2018: [Terminate Hearings]
  • July 24, 2018: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • July 16, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • July 16, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 16, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 16, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • July 16, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • July 13, 2018: [Warrant Issued on Revocation]
  • July 13, 2018: [Order for Warrant - Probation Request]
  • July 13, 2018: [Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 13, 2018: [Request for Warrant]
February, 2018
  • February 06, 2018: [Judgment Returned Executed]
January, 2018
  • January 26, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • January 04, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • January 04, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
December, 2017
  • December 21, 2017: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • December 13, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • December 13, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 13, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 07, 2017: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • December 06, 2017: [Reconsideration]
November, 2017
  • November 17, 2017: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • November 14, 2017: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • November 13, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • November 13, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • November 13, 2017: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • November 13, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 13, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • November 09, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 09, 2017: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
September, 2017
  • September 28, 2017: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • September 27, 2017: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.