U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-50148-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Porcayo
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
May, 2022
  • May 18, 2022: [Order re Exhibits]
July, 2020
  • July 14, 2020: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
June, 2020
  • June 16, 2020: [Transcript]
  • June 13, 2020: [Transcript]
  • June 01, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
  • June 01, 2020: [USCA Judgment]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
March, 2020
  • March 16, 2020: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • March 12, 2020: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • March 11, 2020: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • March 02, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • February 21, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • February 21, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • February 21, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • February 21, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • February 21, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
January, 2020
  • January 10, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • January 03, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
December, 2019
  • December 26, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
October, 2019
  • October 23, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 23, 2019: [Receipt for Return of Exhibits]
  • October 22, 2019: [Order for Return of Exhibit(s)]
  • October 22, 2019: [Verdict (Redacted)]
  • October 22, 2019: [Jury Instructions]
  • October 22, 2019: [Verdict]
  • October 22, 2019: [Jury Question]
  • October 22, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • October 22, 2019: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • October 22, 2019: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • October 21, 2019: [Jury Instructions]
  • October 21, 2019: [Jury Trial - Began]
  • October 21, 2019: [Jury List]
  • October 20, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • October 19, 2019: [In Limine]
  • October 17, 2019: [Order on Motion for Jury List]
  • October 17, 2019: [Jury List]
  • October 16, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • October 03, 2019: [Order]
  • October 03, 2019: [Pretrial Conference]
September, 2019
  • September 27, 2019: [Notice]
  • September 19, 2019: [Joint Notice of Speedy Trial Calculation]
  • September 13, 2019: [Notice]
  • September 13, 2019: [In Limine]
  • September 13, 2019: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
June, 2019
  • June 05, 2019: [Notice]
May, 2019
  • May 16, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 15, 2019: [Terminate Hearings]
  • May 07, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • May 03, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2019
  • April 18, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
February, 2019
  • February 25, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • February 12, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 11, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2019
  • January 08, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
  • January 02, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
October, 2018
  • October 01, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
September, 2018
  • September 06, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 06, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2018
  • June 04, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
May, 2018
  • May 23, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2018
  • February 15, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 09, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • February 07, 2018: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • February 06, 2018: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • January 24, 2018: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • January 24, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 24, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 24, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • January 24, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 24, 2018: [Bail Report]
December, 2017
  • December 27, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2017
  • October 25, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 25, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • October 20, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 04, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 03, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
September, 2017
  • September 28, 2017: [Arrest - Other District]
  • September 28, 2017: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.