U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-30034
  • Case Name: Levi Edward Garrett
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
October, 2019
  • October 28, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Exhibits Destroyed]
  • October 11, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Close Bankruptcy Case Administratively]
  • May 02, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Appeal Order - BAP re: Appeal]
March, 2019
  • March 26, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Transcript (Hearing or Trial)]
  • March 21, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Transcript (Hearing or Trial)]
  • March 04, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Acknowledgement of Request for Transcript of Testimony]
February, 2019
  • February 25, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • February 25, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Appellee Designation]
  • February 25, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Transcript Ordered re: Notice of Appeal]
  • February 20, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Acknowledgement of Request for Transcript of Testimony]
  • February 11, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • February 11, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Statement of Issues on Appeal]
  • February 11, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Transcript Ordered re: Notice of Appeal]
  • February 04, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Appeal - Acknowledgment of Docketing Notice of Appeal]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • January 31, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Appeal - Transmittal to BAP (Text Entry)]
  • January 31, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election (fee required)]
  • January 26, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 24, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Sell Free and Clear of Liens]
  • January 24, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Use Cash Collateral]
  • January 24, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Relief from Automatic Stay]
  • January 24, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Dismissal]
  • January 24, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Dismiss Case]
  • January 24, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • January 23, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • January 22, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
  • January 20, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 18, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • January 16, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
  • January 15, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
  • January 11, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Brief]
  • January 09, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • January 09, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Reduced Notice]
  • January 09, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Reduced Notice (Shortened Notice)(DO NOT USE re motion to use cash collateral or to obtain credit)]
  • January 09, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • January 09, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Sell Free and Clear of Liens and Other Encumbrances (fee required)]
  • January 04, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Response]
December, 2018
  • December 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Use Cash Collateral]
  • December 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • December 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Brief]
  • December 13, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Nonstandard Motion]
  • December 13, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Nonstandard Motion (PRIOR COURT APPROVAL REQUIRED)]
November, 2018
  • November 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 14, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • November 14, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Use Cash Collateral]
  • November 14, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Stipulation]
  • November 13, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Response]
  • November 13, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • November 12, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Stipulation]
  • November 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • November 02, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • November 02, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Reschedule Hearing]
  • November 01, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Court's Exhibit and Witness List]
  • November 01, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • November 01, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Request for Audio of Hearing]
October, 2018
  • October 29, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • October 24, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Brief]
  • October 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Exhibit and/or Witness List]
  • October 22, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Motion/Application (Sets Objection Deadline Only)]
  • October 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Dismiss Case]
  • October 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
  • October 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 04, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • October 03, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • October 03, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • October 03, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • October 03, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Withdrawal of Document]
  • October 02, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Reschedule Hearing]
  • October 01, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
September, 2018
  • September 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • September 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
  • September 22, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • September 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • September 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • September 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Amend Order]
  • September 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Amend Order (No Notice Required)]
  • September 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • September 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • September 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Use Cash Collateral]
  • September 15, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • September 13, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • September 13, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Relief from Automatic Stay]
  • September 12, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Clerk's Certificate of Service (Text Entry)]
  • September 12, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Reschedule Hearing (Text Order)]
  • September 12, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Reschedule Hearing]
August, 2018
  • August 29, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • August 22, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Response]
  • August 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Use Cash Collateral]
  • August 15, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • August 15, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • August 14, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • August 14, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • August 14, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • August 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • August 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • August 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
  • August 07, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • August 07, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Relief from Automatic Stay (fee required)]
  • August 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • August 01, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Response]
  • August 01, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • August 01, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Request for Audio of Hearing]
July, 2018
  • July 28, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • July 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
  • July 25, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • July 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Response]
  • July 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • July 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Abandonment, Compel and Relief from Automatic Stay (fee required)]
  • July 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
  • July 13, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 13, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
  • July 12, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 12, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Joinder]
  • July 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • July 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • July 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • July 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
  • July 02, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Motion/Application (Sets Objection Deadline Only)]
  • July 02, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service Pursuant to LBR 9072-1(b) of Proposed Order]
  • July 02, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Use Cash Collateral]
  • June 29, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 Amended Disclosure Statement]
  • June 28, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Joinder]
  • June 25, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Withdrawal of Document]
  • June 25, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Motion/Application (Sets Objection Deadline Only)]
  • June 25, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • June 22, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Dismiss Case]
  • June 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Stipulation]
May, 2018
  • May 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 07, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Nonstandard Order]
  • May 05, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 04, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • May 03, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • May 03, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • May 03, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Employment of Attorney (Text Order)]
  • May 02, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Support Document]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • April 30, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Set Status Conference]
  • April 30, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Clerk's Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 30, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Reschedule Hearing (Text Order)]
  • April 30, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • April 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • April 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
  • April 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • April 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 Plan Ballot]
  • April 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • April 13, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 12, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Affidavit]
  • April 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Affidavit]
  • April 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Amendment]
  • April 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Use Cash Collateral]
  • April 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Employment of Attorney]
  • April 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • April 03, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Receipt of Filing Fee]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 29, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • March 28, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Use Cash Collateral]
  • March 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • March 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [20 Largest Unsecured Creditors]
  • March 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Stipulation]
  • March 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Set Deadlines]
  • March 24, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 Plan Ballot Form (Sample)]
  • March 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Plan]
  • March 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 Disclosure Statement]
  • March 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • March 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Amended Schedules or Statements with Notice]
  • March 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • March 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • March 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Fee Due (Create Outstanding Fee)]
  • March 22, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Amended Schedules or Statements with Notice]
  • March 22, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • March 22, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
  • March 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • March 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Set Deadlines]
  • March 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Use Cash Collateral]
February, 2018
  • February 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • February 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Reschedule Hearing]
  • February 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Brief]
  • February 24, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 22, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Exhibit and/or Witness List]
  • February 22, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Update Plan or Disclosure Statement Deadline(s)]
  • February 22, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • February 22, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
  • February 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Relief from Automatic Stay]
  • February 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Reschedule Hearing]
  • February 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 15, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • February 15, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Relief from Automatic Stay]
  • February 13, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Reschedule Hearing]
  • February 12, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Set Hearing]
  • February 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Response]
  • February 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Set Hearing]
  • February 05, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • February 02, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
  • February 01, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • February 01, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Relief from Automatic Stay (fee required)]
January, 2018
  • January 29, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Set Evidentiary Hearing]
  • January 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Extend/Limit Exclusivity Period (Ch 11)]
  • January 25, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • January 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • January 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Relief from Automatic Stay (fee required)]
  • January 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • January 13, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • January 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
  • January 03, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
December, 2017
  • December 29, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 27, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Set Hearing]
  • December 22, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 22, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • December 22, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Response]
  • December 22, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • December 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • December 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • December 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Approve Lease]
  • December 19, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • December 17, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 16, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 15, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Use Cash Collateral]
  • December 14, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • December 14, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
  • December 11, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Set Hearing]
  • December 11, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Request to Receive Electronic Notice]
  • December 08, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Response]
  • December 06, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • December 06, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Relief from Automatic Stay (fee required)]
  • December 03, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 02, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 01, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Use Cash Collateral]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • November 30, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • November 30, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Employment of Attorney (Text Order)]
  • November 29, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • November 29, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Set Hearing]
  • November 29, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
  • November 27, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • November 27, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Motion/Application (Sets Objection Deadline Only)]
  • November 27, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Support Document]
  • November 27, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Set Deadlines]
  • November 22, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Use Cash Collateral]
  • November 22, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Approve Lease]
  • November 22, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Employment of Professional]
  • November 22, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Employment of Attorney]
  • November 21, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • November 21, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Relief from Automatic Stay (fee required)]
  • November 19, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 18, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 17, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 17, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic]
  • November 17, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • November 16, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • November 16, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
  • November 16, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 16, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • November 16, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • November 16, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Use Cash Collateral]
  • November 13, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • November 13, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Report of Inability to Appoint Creditors' Committee]
  • November 13, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Statement of Conclusion]
  • November 13, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • November 13, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Set Deadlines]
  • November 13, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Set Hearing]
  • November 10, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Use Cash Collateral]
  • November 08, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Response]
  • November 05, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 03, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Employee Income Records]
  • November 03, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
  • November 03, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • November 03, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Schedules A-J]
  • November 03, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 Statement of Current Monthly Income Form 122B]
  • November 03, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • November 03, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Set Hearing]
  • November 02, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Electronic Notice Registration (Debtor)]
  • November 01, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
October, 2017
  • October 30, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • October 30, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Reduced Notice]
  • October 30, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Reduced Notice (Shortened Notice)(DO NOT USE re motion to use cash collateral or to obtain credit)]
  • October 30, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Dismiss Case]
  • October 30, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Set Hearing]
  • October 27, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • October 26, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 26, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Support Document]
  • October 25, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Response]
  • October 25, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • October 24, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Set Hearing]
  • October 22, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Late Notice]
  • October 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • October 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • October 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Amendment to Mailing List with Notice - Adding Creditors (fee required)]
  • October 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • October 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Extend Deadline to File Plan, Schedules and/or Statements (Text Order)]
  • October 16, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • October 16, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Relief from Automatic Stay (fee required)]
  • October 16, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Confirm Termination or Absence of Stay]
  • October 16, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • October 13, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 13, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • October 12, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • October 12, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Extend Deadline to File Plan, Schedules and/or Statements (No Notice)]
  • October 12, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Employment of Attorney]
  • October 11, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Late Notice]
  • October 10, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • October 10, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • October 10, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Amendment to Mailing List with Notice - Adding Creditors (fee required)]
  • October 05, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 05, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • October 04, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • October 04, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
  • October 03, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Substantive Consolidation]
  • September 29, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • September 28, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • September 28, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • September 28, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • September 28, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [20 Largest Unsecured Creditors]
  • September 28, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.