U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-30033
  • Case Name: James Edward Garrett and Sandra Ann Garrett
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
June, 2019
  • June 10, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • June 06, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • June 05, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Close Bankruptcy Case Administratively]
  • May 02, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Appeal Order - BAP re: Appeal]
March, 2019
  • March 26, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Transcript (Hearing or Trial)]
  • March 21, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Transcript (Hearing or Trial)]
February, 2019
  • February 27, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Acknowledgement of Request for Transcript of Testimony]
  • February 25, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • February 25, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Appellee Designation]
  • February 25, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Transcript Ordered re: Notice of Appeal]
  • February 20, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Acknowledgement of Request for Transcript of Testimony]
  • February 11, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • February 11, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Statement of Issues on Appeal]
  • February 11, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Appellant Designation]
  • February 11, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Transcript Ordered re: Notice of Appeal]
  • February 06, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Appeal - Acknowledgment of Docketing Notice of Appeal]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Appeal - Transmittal to BAP (Text Entry)]
  • January 31, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • January 31, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election (fee required)]
  • January 26, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 25, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 24, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Sell Free and Clear of Liens]
  • January 24, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Use Cash Collateral]
  • January 24, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Corrective Entry]
  • January 24, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Dismissal]
  • January 24, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Dismiss Case]
  • January 24, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • January 24, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 Plan Ballot Form (Sample)]
  • January 24, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 Amended Disclosure Statement]
  • January 24, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Modified Plan]
  • January 23, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Nonstandard Order]
  • January 23, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • January 22, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
  • January 15, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
  • January 13, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 11, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • January 11, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Employment of Professional]
  • January 11, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • January 11, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Brief]
  • January 10, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Reschedule Hearing]
  • January 09, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • January 09, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Reduced Notice]
  • January 09, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • January 09, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Fee Due (Create Outstanding Fee)]
  • January 08, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Reduced Notice (Shortened Notice)(DO NOT USE re motion to use cash collateral or to obtain credit)]
  • January 08, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Sell Free and Clear of Liens and Other Encumbrances (fee required)]
  • January 08, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Sell Property]
  • January 04, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Response]
  • January 04, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
December, 2018
  • December 31, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
  • December 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Brief]
  • December 12, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 12, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Use Cash Collateral]
  • December 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Relief from Automatic Stay]
  • December 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • December 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
  • December 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Minutes (New)]
November, 2018
  • November 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • November 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Response]
  • November 14, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • November 12, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Response]
October, 2018
  • October 25, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • October 25, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Relief from Automatic Stay (fee required)]
  • October 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Dismiss Case]
August, 2018
  • August 25, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • August 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
  • August 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Use Cash Collateral]
  • August 15, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • August 15, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • August 14, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • August 14, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • August 14, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • August 14, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • August 13, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Response]
  • August 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • August 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • August 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • August 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • August 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
  • August 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • August 02, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • August 02, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Response]
  • August 01, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
July, 2018
  • July 30, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • July 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
  • July 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • July 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Relief from Automatic Stay (fee required)]
  • July 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • July 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
  • July 25, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 25, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • July 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • July 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Reschedule Hearing]
  • July 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • July 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • July 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service Pursuant to LBR 9072-1(b) of Proposed Order]
  • July 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • July 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Response]
  • July 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 Amended Disclosure Statement]
  • July 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • July 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Abandonment, Compel and Relief from Automatic Stay (fee required)]
  • July 15, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 13, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Status Letter by Court]
  • July 13, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
  • July 12, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Joinder]
  • July 12, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Affidavit of Default]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Motion/Application (Sets Objection Deadline Only)]
  • June 29, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Use Cash Collateral]
  • June 28, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Joinder]
  • June 25, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Withdrawal of Document]
  • June 25, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Motion/Application (Sets Objection Deadline Only)]
  • June 25, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • June 22, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Dismiss Case]
  • June 14, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 12, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Approve Agreement/Stipulation]
May, 2018
  • May 24, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Approve Agreement (incls. an agreement, compromise, settlement or stipulation)]
  • May 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 07, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Nonstandard Order]
  • May 04, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • May 03, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • May 03, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Stipulation]
  • May 03, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Minutes (New)]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • April 30, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Set Status Conference]
  • April 30, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Clerk's Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 30, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Reschedule Hearing (Text Order)]
  • April 30, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • April 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
  • April 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • April 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 Plan Ballot]
  • April 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Approve Agreement/Stipulation]
  • April 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Order Request]
  • April 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • April 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
March, 2018
  • March 29, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • March 28, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Approve Agreement (incls. an agreement, compromise, settlement or stipulation)]
  • March 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Amended Schedules or Statements with Notice]
  • March 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • March 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • March 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Set Deadlines]
  • March 25, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 Plan Ballot Form (Sample)]
  • March 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Plan]
  • March 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 Disclosure Statement]
  • March 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Late Notice]
  • March 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • March 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Amended Schedules or Statements with Notice]
  • March 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 15, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • March 15, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Employment of Professional (Text Order)]
  • March 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • March 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Employment of Attorney (Text Order)]
  • March 07, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Employment of Professional]
  • March 07, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • March 07, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Employment of Attorney (Text Order)]
  • March 01, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Employment of Attorney]
February, 2018
  • February 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Reschedule Hearing]
  • February 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Employment of Attorney]
  • February 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • February 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Brief]
  • February 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Reschedule Hearing]
  • February 24, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 22, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Exhibit and/or Witness List]
  • February 22, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Update Plan or Disclosure Statement Deadline(s)]
  • February 22, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • February 22, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
  • February 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 15, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • February 15, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Relief from Automatic Stay]
  • February 13, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Reschedule Hearing]
  • February 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Set Hearing]
  • February 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Assume Lease or Executory Contract]
  • February 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • February 05, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Support Document]
  • February 05, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • February 02, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 29, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
  • January 29, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Assume Lease or Executory Contract]
  • January 29, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Set Evidentiary Hearing]
  • January 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Assume Executory Contract or Lease (Filed by DIP or Trustee)]
  • January 25, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Extend/Limit Exclusivity Period (Ch 11)]
  • January 25, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • January 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Assume Executory Contract or Lease (Filed by DIP or Trustee)]
  • January 13, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • January 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
  • January 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
December, 2017
  • December 29, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 27, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Amendment of Mailing List with Notice]
  • December 27, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Set Hearing]
  • December 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • December 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • December 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Response]
  • December 16, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 14, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
  • December 14, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • December 14, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Employment of Professional (Text Order)]
  • December 13, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 13, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Support Document]
  • December 11, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Use Cash Collateral]
  • December 11, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Set Hearing]
  • December 11, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Request to Receive Electronic Notice]
  • December 08, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Response]
  • December 08, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • December 08, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • December 08, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • December 07, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 06, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • December 06, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Relief from Automatic Stay (fee required)]
  • December 05, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Assume Lease or Executory Contract]
  • December 03, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 01, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Use Cash Collateral]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • November 29, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 29, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • November 29, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Set Hearing]
  • November 29, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
  • November 27, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Use Cash Collateral]
  • November 23, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 21, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • November 21, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Relief from Automatic Stay (fee required)]
  • November 21, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • November 21, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Set Deadlines]
  • November 21, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Assume Executory Contract or Lease (Filed by DIP or Trustee)]
  • November 21, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Use Cash Collateral]
  • November 21, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Set Hearing]
  • November 18, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 16, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • November 16, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • November 16, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
  • November 13, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Report of Inability to Appoint Creditors' Committee]
  • November 13, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Statement of Conclusion]
  • November 13, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Set Hearing]
  • November 09, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 08, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Response]
  • November 07, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Use Cash Collateral]
  • November 07, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • November 07, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
  • November 07, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Response]
  • November 06, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • November 05, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 03, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Employee Income Records]
  • November 03, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 Statement of Current Monthly Income Form 122B]
  • November 03, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • November 03, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Schedules A-J]
  • November 03, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
  • November 03, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • November 03, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic]
  • November 03, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Set Hearing]
  • November 03, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 02, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Set Deadlines]
  • November 02, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • November 02, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • November 02, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Nonstandard Motion (PRIOR COURT APPROVAL REQUIRED)]
  • November 02, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Use Cash Collateral]
  • November 02, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Electronic Notice Registration (Debtor)]
  • November 01, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
October, 2017
  • October 30, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • October 30, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • October 30, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Reduced Notice]
  • October 30, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Reduced Notice (Shortened Notice)(DO NOT USE re motion to use cash collateral or to obtain credit)]
  • October 30, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Dismiss Case]
  • October 30, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Set Hearing]
  • October 26, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 26, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Support Document]
  • October 25, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Response]
  • October 25, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • October 25, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Employment of Professional]
  • October 24, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Set Hearing]
  • October 22, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • October 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Extend Deadline to File Plan, Schedules and/or Statements (Text Order)]
  • October 16, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • October 16, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Relief from Automatic Stay (fee required)]
  • October 16, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Confirm Termination or Absence of Stay]
  • October 13, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 13, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • October 12, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • October 12, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Extend Deadline to File Plan, Schedules and/or Statements (No Notice)]
  • October 12, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Employment of Attorney]
  • October 11, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Late Notice]
  • October 10, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • October 10, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Amendment to Mailing List with Notice - Adding Creditors (fee required)]
  • October 05, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 04, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • October 04, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • October 04, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
  • October 03, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • October 03, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Substantive Consolidation]
  • September 29, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • September 29, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • September 28, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • September 28, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • September 28, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [20 Largest Unsecured Creditors]
  • September 28, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • September 28, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.