U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-50137-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rosaaen
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2018
  • December 18, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
March, 2018
  • March 26, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • March 23, 2018: [Order]
  • March 23, 2018: [Receipt for Payment]
  • March 23, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 23, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • March 13, 2018: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • March 13, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 12, 2018: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • March 12, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 12, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 12, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • March 12, 2018: [Receipt for Payment]
February, 2018
  • February 21, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 12, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2017
  • December 04, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 17, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2017
  • October 13, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 11, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • October 11, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 11, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 11, 2017: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • October 11, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 11, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • October 11, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 11, 2017: [Bail Report]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • September 29, 2017: [Case Unsealed]
  • September 29, 2017: [Unseal Case]
  • September 28, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • September 28, 2017: [Ex Parte Motion for Summons]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.