U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cr-10032-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lieras
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 08, 2021: [Mail Returned]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 13, 2021: [Proposed Order]
October, 2020
  • October 15, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2020
  • September 14, 2020: [Mail Returned]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: [Order]
  • August 26, 2020: [Proposed Order]
July, 2020
  • July 27, 2020: [Answer of Garnishee]
  • July 15, 2020: [Certificate]
  • July 14, 2020: [Clerk's Notice of Post-Judgment Garnishment]
  • July 14, 2020: [Writ of Continuing Garnishment Issued]
  • July 14, 2020: [Application for Writ of Continuing Garnishment]
  • July 13, 2020: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
April, 2018
  • April 16, 2018: [Terminate Hearings]
  • April 16, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • April 13, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 06, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
March, 2018
  • March 29, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 29, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • March 28, 2018: [Receipt for Payment]
  • March 28, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 28, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • March 20, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 20, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 19, 2018: [Consent]
  • March 06, 2018: [Same Day Plea and Sentencing]
  • March 02, 2018: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • March 01, 2018: [Information - Misdemeanor - Superseding]
  • March 01, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 01, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • March 01, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
November, 2017
  • November 15, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 09, 2017: [Memorandum Letter]
  • November 07, 2017: [Consent]
  • November 07, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2017
  • October 16, 2017: [Order]
  • October 16, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 16, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release (RESTRICTED)]
  • October 16, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • October 13, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • October 12, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 12, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 12, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • October 12, 2017: [Request]
  • October 12, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • October 11, 2017: [Request]
  • October 10, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 05, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • September 28, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • September 28, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.