U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-50139-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Pawn With Us
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2018
  • June 01, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • June 01, 2018: [Order]
  • June 01, 2018: [Receipt for Payment]
  • June 01, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 01, 2018: [Sentencing]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 31, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
April, 2018
  • April 23, 2018: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 20, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 20, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • April 20, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
March, 2018
  • March 23, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 13, 2018: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • March 13, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 09, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2018
  • February 21, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 12, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • February 09, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2018
  • January 18, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 16, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 12, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2017
  • November 17, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 13, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • November 13, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 01, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
October, 2017
  • October 13, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 11, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • October 11, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 11, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • October 04, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • September 29, 2017: [Case Unsealed]
  • September 29, 2017: [Unseal Case]
  • September 28, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • September 28, 2017: [Ex Parte Motion for Summons]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.