U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-50136-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Foster
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2018
  • July 19, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • July 13, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • July 13, 2018: [Order]
  • July 13, 2018: [Consent]
  • July 13, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 13, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • July 05, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2018
  • June 20, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • June 20, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • June 20, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 18, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 15, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2018
  • April 17, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 06, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • April 06, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2018
  • March 13, 2018: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
February, 2018
  • February 21, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 13, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • February 09, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2017
  • November 21, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 17, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • November 17, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2017
  • October 25, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • October 13, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 11, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • October 11, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 11, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 11, 2017: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • October 11, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 11, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • October 11, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 11, 2017: [Bail Report]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • September 29, 2017: [Case Unsealed]
  • September 29, 2017: [Unseal Case]
  • September 28, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • September 28, 2017: [Ex Parte Motion for Summons]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.