U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-30116-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Tree Top
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2020
  • February 27, 2020: [Appeal Record Returned]
October, 2019
  • October 09, 2019: [Judgment - Amended]
  • October 08, 2019: [Sentencing]
August, 2019
  • August 23, 2019: [USCA Mandate]
  • August 07, 2019: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
July, 2019
  • July 29, 2019: [USCA Judgment]
  • July 29, 2019: [USCA Opinion]
January, 2019
  • January 25, 2019: [Transmittal of Subsequent Filing to 8th Circuit COA]
  • January 25, 2019: [Supplement]
May, 2018
  • May 07, 2018: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • May 04, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Public Transcript for Redaction Purposes]
  • May 04, 2018: [Transcript - Public]
  • May 04, 2018: [Transcript - Restricted]
April, 2018
  • April 19, 2018: [USCA Order]
  • April 19, 2018: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • April 17, 2018: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • April 17, 2018: [Court Reporter Information]
  • April 17, 2018: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • April 10, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 05, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 05, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • April 04, 2018: [Receipt for Return of Exhibits]
  • April 04, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • April 04, 2018: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • April 04, 2018: [Sentencing]
March, 2018
  • March 29, 2018: [Notice]
  • March 19, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • March 19, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 14, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 13, 2018: [Continue]
  • March 08, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • March 08, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • March 08, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
February, 2018
  • February 26, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • February 26, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • February 09, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
December, 2017
  • December 29, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 29, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 27, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 21, 2017: [Petition to Plead Guilty]
  • December 05, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 04, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 04, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2017
  • October 18, 2017: [Order]
  • October 11, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • October 11, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • October 10, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • October 10, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • October 10, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • October 10, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 10, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 10, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 10, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • October 10, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 10, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 06, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 06, 2017: [Request]
  • October 05, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 05, 2017: [Request]
  • October 05, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 05, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 05, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [Case Unsealed]
  • September 28, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • September 28, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 28, 2017: [Order]
  • September 28, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.