U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-50140-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Relf
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2018
  • September 18, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
July, 2018
  • July 30, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • July 27, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 27, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • July 27, 2018: [Order]
  • July 27, 2018: [Consent]
  • July 27, 2018: [Receipt for Payment]
  • July 18, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 17, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 17, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 17, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
June, 2018
  • June 13, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 12, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • June 12, 2018: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
March, 2018
  • March 28, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 20, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2018
  • February 01, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
January, 2018
  • January 23, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2017
  • December 20, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • December 06, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
November, 2017
  • November 28, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 15, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • November 03, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • November 03, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 03, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 03, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 03, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • November 03, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 03, 2017: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • November 03, 2017: [Bail Report]
October, 2017
  • October 13, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 11, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • October 11, 2017: [Status Conference]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • September 29, 2017: [Unseal Case]
  • September 29, 2017: [Case Unsealed]
  • September 28, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • September 28, 2017: [Ex Parte Motion for Summons]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.