U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-50141-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Brodersen
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 05, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Count(s)]
  • March 04, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 01, 2021: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 01, 2021: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • March 01, 2021: [Order]
February, 2021
  • February 24, 2021: [Dismiss Count]
  • February 24, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 24, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • February 24, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
January, 2021
  • January 25, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 22, 2021: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • January 22, 2021: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 22, 2021: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 22, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
December, 2020
  • December 01, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
November, 2020
  • November 25, 2020: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • November 17, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 16, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2020
  • August 14, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 04, 2020: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • August 04, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2020
  • May 27, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 21, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 21, 2020: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
March, 2020
  • March 16, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 16, 2020: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • March 12, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2020
  • January 21, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 02, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 02, 2020: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
October, 2019
  • October 28, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 17, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • October 17, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2019
  • August 27, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 26, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • August 22, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2019
  • May 23, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 14, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 14, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
March, 2019
  • March 08, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • February 28, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
December, 2018
  • December 11, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 03, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • December 03, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2018
  • September 12, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 11, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • September 11, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2018
  • June 18, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • June 13, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 12, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2018
  • April 17, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 12, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 12, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
February, 2018
  • February 13, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 12, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • February 06, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2017
  • November 03, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
October, 2017
  • October 25, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • October 25, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • October 24, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 16, 2017: [Request]
  • October 13, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 11, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • October 11, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 11, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 11, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • October 11, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 11, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • October 11, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 11, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • September 29, 2017: [Case Unsealed]
  • September 29, 2017: [Unseal Case]
  • September 28, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • September 28, 2017: [Ex Parte Motion for Summons]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.