U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-50157-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Belitz
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 20, 2021: [Notice of Expiration of Probation]
July, 2020
  • July 24, 2020: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 23, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 22, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • July 10, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • July 03, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 03, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • July 03, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • July 02, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
June, 2020
  • June 26, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • June 19, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
May, 2020
  • May 14, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 11, 2020: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • May 08, 2020: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • May 08, 2020: [Pre-Sentence Payment]
  • May 08, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 07, 2020: [Information - Misdemeanor - Superseding]
April, 2020
  • April 08, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
March, 2020
  • March 18, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 18, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 18, 2020: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 18, 2020: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • March 11, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 11, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 06, 2020: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • March 06, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2019
  • December 23, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • December 16, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 13, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • December 13, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2019
  • October 01, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
September, 2019
  • September 20, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • September 20, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2019
  • July 19, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • July 10, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 05, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2019
  • April 16, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 09, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • April 05, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 04, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2019
  • January 23, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 18, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 11, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2018
  • October 25, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 23, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • October 19, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2018
  • August 01, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
July, 2018
  • July 30, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • July 26, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2018
  • May 16, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 14, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • May 10, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2018
  • February 21, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 16, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • February 09, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2018
  • January 02, 2018: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
December, 2017
  • December 06, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
November, 2017
  • November 14, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • November 13, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 03, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2017
  • October 20, 2017: [Mail Returned]
  • October 18, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 17, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • October 16, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 13, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 11, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • October 11, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 11, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • October 11, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 11, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 11, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 11, 2017: [Bail Report]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • September 29, 2017: [Case Unsealed]
  • September 29, 2017: [Unseal Case]
  • September 28, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • September 28, 2017: [Ex Parte Motion for Summons]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.