U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-30123-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jensen et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2018
  • April 23, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • April 12, 2018: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • April 11, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 11, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • April 11, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • April 11, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 11, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • April 11, 2018: [Receipt for Payment]
  • April 06, 2018: [Oral Scheduling Order]
March, 2018
  • March 21, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 15, 2018: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 15, 2018: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • March 14, 2018: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 14, 2018: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • March 13, 2018: [Information - Misdemeanor - Superseding]
  • March 12, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 12, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • March 12, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 02, 2018: [Information - Misdemeanor - Superseding]
  • March 02, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 02, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 02, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
February, 2018
  • February 15, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 12, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • February 05, 2018: [Consent]
  • February 05, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2017
  • December 01, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
November, 2017
  • November 28, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • November 28, 2017: [Consent]
  • November 28, 2017: [Continue]
  • November 28, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2017
  • October 18, 2017: [Order]
  • October 13, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • October 11, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • October 10, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 10, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release (RESTRICTED)]
  • October 10, 2017: [Request]
  • October 10, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 10, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 10, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 10, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • October 06, 2017: [Request]
  • October 06, 2017: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • October 06, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 06, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • October 05, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 05, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 05, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 05, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [Case Unsealed]
  • September 28, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • September 28, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 28, 2017: [Order]
  • September 28, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.