U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-30124-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Marin
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2018
  • May 01, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
March, 2018
  • March 29, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • March 29, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • March 29, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 29, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • March 28, 2018: [Receipt for Payment]
  • March 21, 2018: [Oral Scheduling Order]
  • March 09, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 09, 2018: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 08, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 08, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • March 08, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 07, 2018: [Receipt for CJA Repayment]
February, 2018
  • February 02, 2018: [Receipt for CJA Repayment]
January, 2018
  • January 24, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 19, 2018: [Consent]
  • January 18, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2017
  • December 29, 2017: [Receipt for CJA Repayment]
  • December 01, 2017: [Receipt for CJA Repayment]
  • December 01, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 01, 2017: [Consent]
  • December 01, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: [Consent]
  • November 27, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2017
  • October 30, 2017: [Receipt for CJA Repayment]
  • October 12, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • October 12, 2017: [Order]
  • October 11, 2017: [Request]
  • October 11, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • October 10, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 10, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 10, 2017: [Order for Repayment of CJA Fees]
  • October 10, 2017: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • October 10, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 10, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 10, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • October 10, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 06, 2017: [Request]
  • October 06, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 06, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • October 05, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 05, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 05, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [Case Unsealed]
  • September 28, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • September 28, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 28, 2017: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.