U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-30119-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Dupris
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • April 29, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • April 18, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • April 18, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • April 18, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • April 17, 2019: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • April 17, 2019: [Furlough]
  • April 15, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • April 10, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • April 05, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • April 04, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
March, 2019
  • March 26, 2019: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • March 22, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • March 21, 2019: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • March 20, 2019: [Furlough]
  • March 19, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • March 19, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • March 18, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • March 18, 2019: [Release from Custody]
  • March 08, 2019: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • March 06, 2019: [Furlough]
  • March 01, 2019: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
February, 2019
  • February 27, 2019: [Furlough]
  • February 13, 2019: [Receipt for Return of Exhibits]
  • February 13, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 12, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 06, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 06, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • February 06, 2019: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • February 06, 2019: [Verdict (Redacted)]
  • February 06, 2019: [Verdict]
  • February 06, 2019: [Jury Instructions]
  • February 06, 2019: [Jury Trial - Began]
  • February 05, 2019: [Jury Instructions]
  • February 05, 2019: [Jury List]
  • February 04, 2019: [Pretrial Conference]
  • February 04, 2019: [Witness List]
  • February 04, 2019: [Response]
  • February 01, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • February 01, 2019: [Witness List]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • January 30, 2019: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • January 30, 2019: [Notice]
  • January 29, 2019: [In Limine]
  • January 29, 2019: [Extend]
  • January 29, 2019: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 29, 2019: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 29, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • January 28, 2019: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • January 28, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • January 28, 2019: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
December, 2018
  • December 28, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 19, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 19, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
November, 2018
  • November 06, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 31, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2018
  • September 18, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 18, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 18, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • September 18, 2018: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 18, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 17, 2018: [Invocation of Rights]
  • September 17, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 16, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 16, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 16, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • September 16, 2018: [Arrest]
  • September 16, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 14, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • September 14, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 14, 2018: [Request]
  • September 13, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • September 13, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 12, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • September 12, 2018: [Indictment]
  • September 12, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
April, 2018
  • April 25, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Count(s)]
  • April 24, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 24, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • April 24, 2018: [Receipt for Payment]
  • April 24, 2018: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • April 24, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 24, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • April 24, 2018: [Dismiss Count]
  • April 24, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • April 24, 2018: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • April 18, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • April 18, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • April 18, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • April 09, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • April 06, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • April 03, 2018: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
March, 2018
  • March 02, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 09, 2018: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • February 09, 2018: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • February 07, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • February 07, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • February 07, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
January, 2018
  • January 11, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 08, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 08, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2017
  • December 01, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
November, 2017
  • November 29, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 29, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
October, 2017
  • October 18, 2017: [Order]
  • October 11, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • October 11, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • October 10, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • October 10, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 10, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 10, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 10, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 10, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 10, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • October 10, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 06, 2017: [Request]
  • October 06, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • October 06, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 05, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 05, 2017: [Request]
  • October 05, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 05, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 05, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [Case Unsealed]
  • September 28, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • September 28, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 28, 2017: [Order to Unseal Case]
  • September 28, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.