U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-50217
  • Case Name: Jean Lesta Randolph
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 27, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (text order)]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Statement re: Death/Incompetency of Debtor]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Change of Address (debtor) (text entry only)]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Withdrawal of Document (text entry only)]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Response]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Turnover of Property From Debtor(s)]
January, 2018
  • January 30, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Closing Case]
December, 2017
  • December 29, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 27, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Discharging Debtor(s)]
November, 2017
  • November 14, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Amendment to Schedules or Statements with Notice]
  • November 01, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certification About a Financial Management Course - Form 423]
October, 2017
  • October 27, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
  • October 27, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
  • October 01, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Waiver of Chapter 7 Filing Fee]
  • September 29, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • September 29, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • September 29, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Add Trustee]
  • September 29, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Employee Income Records]
  • September 29, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Electronic Notice Registration (Debtor)]
  • September 29, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • September 29, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • September 29, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • September 29, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Waiver of Chapter 7 Filing Fee(s) (Individual)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.