U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cv-05079
  • Case Name: Montague v. American Family Mutual Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2019
  • January 24, 2019: [Judgment]
  • January 24, 2019: [Stipulation of Dismissal (Attorney)]
December, 2018
  • December 11, 2018: [Settlement Conference]
November, 2018
  • November 07, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
October, 2018
  • October 23, 2018: [Return of Service]
September, 2018
  • September 19, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • September 17, 2018: [Extend Deadlines]
July, 2018
  • July 12, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • July 03, 2018: [Designation of Expert Witness]
June, 2018
  • June 11, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • June 08, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
May, 2018
  • May 08, 2018: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • May 04, 2018: [Protective Order]
December, 2017
  • December 12, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 11, 2017: [Discovery Report]
November, 2017
  • November 08, 2017: [Order for Discovery Report]
  • November 08, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • November 08, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • November 07, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • November 02, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
October, 2017
  • October 16, 2017: [Acknowledgment of Service]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • September 29, 2017: [Filing Fee Received]
  • September 29, 2017: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • September 29, 2017: [Complaint (COURT USE ONLY)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.