U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-50218
  • Case Name: Richard Stanley Patryas, Jr.
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Close Bankruptcy Case Administratively]
  • January 16, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Nonstandard Order]
December, 2017
  • December 18, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Show Cause]
October, 2017
  • October 28, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 27, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - dismissed or converted, no funds]
  • October 26, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Dismissal]
  • October 26, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Dismiss Case]
  • October 26, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Affidavit of Default]
  • October 17, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service]
  • October 17, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Reduced Notice]
  • October 17, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Reduced Notice (Shortened Notice)(DO NOT USE re motion to use cash collateral or to obtain credit)]
  • October 17, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Dismiss Case]
  • October 04, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 02, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Nonstandard Order]
  • October 02, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Update Deficiency Deadline(s)]
  • October 02, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Corrective Entry]
  • October 02, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • October 02, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement About Payment of Eviction Judgment (Form 101B)]
  • October 02, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Initial Statement of Eviction Judgment (Form 101A)]
  • October 02, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • October 02, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Electronic Notice Registration (Debtor)]
  • October 02, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Waiver of Chapter 7 Filing Fee(s) (Individual)]
  • October 02, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • October 02, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • October 02, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Add Trustee]
  • October 02, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.