U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-50147-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Richards
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: [USCA Mandate]
  • October 05, 2018: [USCA Judgment]
September, 2018
  • September 21, 2018: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • September 20, 2018: [Transcript - Public]
  • September 20, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Public Transcript for Redaction Purposes]
  • September 20, 2018: [Transcript - Restricted]
August, 2018
  • August 14, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • August 01, 2018: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Public Transcript for Redaction Purposes]
  • July 31, 2018: [Transcript - Public]
  • July 31, 2018: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • July 12, 2018: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • July 10, 2018: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • July 10, 2018: [Court Reporter Information]
  • July 09, 2018: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • July 03, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 03, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • June 26, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • June 26, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • June 26, 2018: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • June 22, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • June 22, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • June 22, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • June 22, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
May, 2018
  • May 21, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • May 18, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • May 07, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
March, 2018
  • March 12, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • March 02, 2018: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • March 02, 2018: [Consent]
  • March 02, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
February, 2018
  • February 08, 2018: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • February 08, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • February 08, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • February 08, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 05, 2018: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • February 05, 2018: [Compel ]
January, 2018
  • January 12, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • January 08, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 04, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 21, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • November 14, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2017
  • October 23, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • October 16, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • October 05, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 05, 2017: [Notice]
  • October 04, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • October 04, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • October 04, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 04, 2017: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • October 04, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 04, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • October 04, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 04, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • October 04, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 03, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • October 03, 2017: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • October 02, 2017: [Case Unsealed]
  • October 02, 2017: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • October 02, 2017: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.