U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-40455
  • Case Name: Bettor Racing, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 26, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Closing Case]
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Chapter 7 Trustee's Final Rpt/Acct-Asset]
May, 2022
  • May 04, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • May 04, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Trustee's Report of Small Dividends/Unclaimed Funds]
January, 2022
  • January 26, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 24, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • January 24, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Allowing Administrative Expense (text order)]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 28, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Notice of Trustee's Final Report and Applications for Compensation]
  • December 28, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Chapter 7 Trustee's Final Rpt & Applications for Compensation]
  • December 17, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Report of Sale (text entry only)]
April, 2021
  • April 15, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Notice of Change of Address]
  • April 08, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 06, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Compensation]
  • April 05, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Notice of Change of Address]
March, 2021
  • March 25, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Withdrawal of Document (text entry only)]
  • March 25, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Stipulation for Dismissal]
  • March 14, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 12, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Application 1,000 or Less (without notice)]
  • March 12, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Compensation]
  • March 12, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Compensation 1,000 or Less (Without Notice)]
  • March 11, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 09, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Compensation]
  • March 03, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Certificate of Service]
  • March 01, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Certificate of Service]
February, 2021
  • February 25, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Certificate of Service]
  • February 22, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Certificate of Service]
  • February 17, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Certificate of Service]
  • February 16, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Certificate of Service]
  • February 12, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 11, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Request for Discontinuance of Notice (text entry only)]
  • February 10, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 10, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • February 10, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Objection to Proof of Claim]
  • February 10, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Compensation]
  • February 08, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Approve Agreement/Stipulation]
  • February 02, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
January, 2021
  • January 27, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 25, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Preserve Unadministered Asset]
  • January 22, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 20, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Clerk's Certificate of Mailing]
  • January 20, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • January 19, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Response]
  • January 12, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Preserve Unadministered Asset (Trustee Only)]
  • January 12, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Approve Agreement (incls. an agreement, compromise, settlement or stipulation)]
  • January 04, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Certificate of Service]
December, 2020
  • December 28, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Response]
  • December 28, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Certificate of Service]
  • December 15, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Notice of Motion/Application]
  • December 14, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Objection to Claim]
September, 2020
  • September 19, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • September 18, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • September 18, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Transcript (Depositions and 2004 Exams Only)]
  • September 10, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • September 08, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Application 1,000 or Less (Without Notice)]
  • September 08, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Compensation 1,000 or Less (Without Notice)]
May, 2020
  • May 06, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Notice of Withdrawal of Claim (Text Entry)]
March, 2020
  • March 12, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 10, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Objection to Proof of Claim]
February, 2020
  • February 05, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • February 05, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Objection to Claim]
December, 2019
  • December 11, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Close Adversary Case]
October, 2019
  • October 01, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Complaint]
September, 2019
  • September 19, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • September 17, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Application 1,000 or Less (Without Notice)]
  • September 17, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Compensation 1,000 or Less (Without Notice)]
  • September 13, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • September 11, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • September 11, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Employment of Professional (Text Order)]
  • September 06, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Complaint]
  • September 03, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Employment of Professional]
September, 2018
  • September 16, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • September 14, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Relief from Automatic Stay]
  • September 14, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Nonstandard Motion]
August, 2018
  • August 27, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Notice of Motion/Application (Sets Objection Deadline Only)]
  • August 27, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Certificate of Service]
  • August 27, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • August 27, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Relief from Automatic Stay (fee required)]
  • August 27, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Nonstandard Motion (PRIOR COURT APPROVAL REQUIRED)]
April, 2018
  • April 18, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Certificate of Service]
February, 2018
  • February 07, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Change of Address (Debtor Only) (Text Entry)]
January, 2018
  • January 25, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 23, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Turnover of Property from Debtor]
  • January 19, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 17, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Sell Property]
  • January 17, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • January 17, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Employment of Professional (Text Order)]
  • January 12, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Turnover of Property from Debtor]
  • January 08, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Employment of Professional]
December, 2017
  • December 29, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Certificate of Service]
  • December 22, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Sell Property]
  • December 01, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Certificate of Service]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • November 30, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Amended Schedules or Statements with Notice]
  • November 30, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Amendment to Schedules or Statements with Notice]
  • November 26, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 24, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • November 24, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Employment of Attorney (Text Order)]
  • November 18, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 16, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Certificate of Service]
  • November 16, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Application 1,000 or Less (Without Notice)]
  • November 15, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Compensation 1,000 or Less (Without Notice)]
  • November 15, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Employment of Attorney]
  • November 11, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 10, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Certificate of Service]
  • November 10, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
  • November 09, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Late Notice]
  • November 08, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • November 08, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Amendment to Schedules or Statements with Notice]
October, 2017
  • October 28, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 26, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • October 26, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Employment of Professional (Text Order)]
  • October 25, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 22, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Notice of Recovery of Assets]
  • October 18, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Employment of Professional]
  • October 16, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • October 16, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Meeting of Creditors Continued/Rescheduled]
  • October 15, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 13, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • October 13, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • October 13, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Employment of Attorney (Text Order)]
  • October 12, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • October 05, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Employment of Attorney]
  • October 04, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 02, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Statement of Corporate Ownership]
  • October 02, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • October 02, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • October 02, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • October 02, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Update Deadline(s) Public Event]
  • October 02, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • October 02, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Add Trustee]
  • October 02, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.