U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-50121-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Poor Thunder
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2019
  • October 17, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
September, 2019
  • September 23, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • September 09, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • September 09, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • September 09, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 05, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
August, 2019
  • August 15, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 08, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • August 07, 2019: [Continue]
July, 2019
  • July 23, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 16, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
  • July 15, 2019: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • July 15, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 01, 2019: [Furlough]
June, 2019
  • June 11, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 10, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • June 10, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 10, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 10, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • June 10, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 10, 2019: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • June 10, 2019: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 10, 2019: [Text Order Holding Defendant to Answer Revocation Petition]
  • June 10, 2019: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • June 07, 2019: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • June 06, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 06, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
May, 2019
  • May 29, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
January, 2018
  • January 29, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • January 29, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 29, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • January 22, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • January 22, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • January 22, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • January 22, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • January 22, 2018: [Sealed Supporting Document(s)]
December, 2017
  • December 05, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • December 04, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
October, 2017
  • October 26, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • October 20, 2017: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • October 20, 2017: [Consent]
  • October 20, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 16, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • October 13, 2017: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • October 13, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • October 13, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 13, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • October 12, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 04, 2017: [Request]
  • October 04, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 04, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • October 04, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • October 04, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 04, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • October 04, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 04, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • October 04, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 04, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 04, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • October 04, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 04, 2017: [Case Unsealed]
  • October 04, 2017: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.