U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:12-cr-40072-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rios
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 22, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • April 22, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
December, 2018
  • December 03, 2018: [Text Scheduling Order]
August, 2018
  • August 08, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
April, 2018
  • April 13, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
March, 2018
  • March 21, 2018: [Allocution Statement]
  • March 15, 2018: [Allocution Statement]
February, 2018
  • February 22, 2018: [Notice]
  • February 02, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
October, 2017
  • October 18, 2017: [Release from Custody]
  • October 18, 2017: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • October 18, 2017: [Finding of Probable Cause]
  • October 12, 2017: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • October 12, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 11, 2017: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • October 11, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • October 11, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • October 11, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 11, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • October 11, 2017: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • October 11, 2017: [Oral Order]
  • October 10, 2017: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • October 06, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 06, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.