U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cr-40077-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Maynard
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 13, 2022: [Mail Returned]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence]
  • May 31, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 16, 2022: [Reduce Sentence]
  • May 16, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2020
  • July 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Relief under FIRST STEP Act]
  • July 06, 2020: [Letter]
June, 2020
  • June 16, 2020: [Response]
  • June 08, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • June 05, 2020: [Extend]
  • June 02, 2020: [Notice of Intent Not to Supplement]
May, 2020
  • May 05, 2020: [Mail Returned]
  • May 01, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 01, 2020: [Continue]
April, 2020
  • April 28, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • April 28, 2020: [Extend]
  • April 28, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 28, 2020: [Letter]
  • April 20, 2020: [Motion for Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
August, 2018
  • August 06, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • July 31, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 30, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • July 23, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • July 23, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 23, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • July 02, 2018: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • July 02, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
June, 2018
  • June 20, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • June 06, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 05, 2018: [Continue]
  • June 04, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
April, 2018
  • April 12, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 12, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 06, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 06, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • April 06, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 06, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
January, 2018
  • January 04, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
December, 2017
  • December 28, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 28, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 11, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • December 04, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 01, 2017: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • December 01, 2017: [Discovery]
November, 2017
  • November 28, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 28, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 20, 2017: [Response]
  • November 13, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 13, 2017: [Request]
  • November 09, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • November 08, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • November 08, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 08, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 08, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 08, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • November 08, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 08, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • November 08, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2017
  • October 13, 2017: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • October 10, 2017: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.