U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:98-cr-30026-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Salway
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2018
  • November 20, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 15, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2018
  • October 10, 2018: [Notice]
  • October 10, 2018: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
March, 2018
  • March 12, 2018: [Receipt for Payment]
February, 2018
  • February 21, 2018: [Receipt for Payment]
  • February 13, 2018: [Receipt for Payment]
January, 2018
  • January 17, 2018: [Receipt for Payment]
  • January 04, 2018: [Receipt for Payment]
December, 2017
  • December 26, 2017: [Receipt for Payment]
November, 2017
  • November 27, 2017: [Receipt for Payment]
  • November 06, 2017: [Receipt for Payment]
October, 2017
  • October 23, 2017: [Receipt for Payment]
  • October 10, 2017: [Receipt for Payment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.