U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-50223
  • Case Name: Vivianna Silvia Ramos
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2018
  • April 12, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 10, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Closing Case]
March, 2018
  • March 09, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
February, 2018
  • February 01, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
January, 2018
  • January 30, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Discharging Debtor(s)]
  • January 26, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certification About a Financial Management Course - Form 423]
December, 2017
  • December 14, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 11, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Deficiency Financial Management Course]
  • December 01, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
October, 2017
  • October 13, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 11, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • October 11, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Employee Income Records]
  • October 11, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • October 11, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • October 11, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Add Trustee]
  • October 11, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • October 11, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Voluntary Petition Chapter 7 case upload]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.