U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cr-40094-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Fuentes-Lemus
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2017
  • November 21, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 21, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • November 20, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 20, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • November 16, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 13, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 03, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • November 03, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
October, 2017
  • October 27, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 25, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • October 25, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • October 25, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 24, 2017: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • October 11, 2017: [Oral Order]
  • October 11, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • October 11, 2017: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.