U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cr-40092-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hernandez-Serrano
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2017
  • December 20, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 20, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • December 20, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 20, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • December 13, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 05, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • December 05, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
November, 2017
  • November 27, 2017: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • November 20, 2017: [Discovery]
  • November 03, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 02, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 02, 2017: [Petition to Plead Guilty]
  • November 01, 2017: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
October, 2017
  • October 16, 2017: [Response]
  • October 12, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 11, 2017: [Oral Order]
  • October 11, 2017: [Indictment]
  • October 11, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • October 11, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.