U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cr-40091-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Garreau
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2019
  • January 08, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 08, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • January 04, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • January 04, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
December, 2018
  • December 20, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • December 20, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • December 20, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • December 20, 2018: [Continue]
November, 2018
  • November 27, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 26, 2018: [Continue]
  • November 15, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 15, 2018: [Continue]
  • November 08, 2018: [Text Scheduling Order]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
September, 2018
  • September 10, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 10, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Count(s)]
  • September 10, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 05, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 04, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • September 04, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • September 04, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 03, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 03, 2018: [Dismiss Count]
August, 2018
  • August 30, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 22, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 21, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2018
  • July 13, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • July 03, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 03, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 23, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 23, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 04, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
March, 2018
  • March 27, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 27, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 14, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 07, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 06, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2018
  • February 26, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • February 14, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 13, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2017
  • December 19, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 13, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 12, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2017
  • November 27, 2017: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • November 20, 2017: [Discovery]
October, 2017
  • October 25, 2017: [Response]
  • October 19, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 19, 2017: [Request]
  • October 18, 2017: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • October 18, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • October 18, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • October 18, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • October 18, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 18, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 18, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 18, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • October 17, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • October 12, 2017: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • October 12, 2017: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • October 12, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 11, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • October 11, 2017: [Indictment]
  • October 11, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.