U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cr-40090-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Provincial
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2020
  • November 11, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
October, 2020
  • October 06, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
April, 2019
  • April 18, 2019: [28:2255 Motion to Vacate (filed in Civil Case)]
August, 2018
  • August 24, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: [Judgment Returned Executed]
May, 2018
  • May 10, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • May 10, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • May 09, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • May 08, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • May 04, 2018: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • May 04, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 03, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • May 02, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 02, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
April, 2018
  • April 18, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • April 12, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • April 06, 2018: [Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • April 06, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
February, 2018
  • February 20, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 15, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 15, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 14, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 13, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • February 13, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • February 13, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
November, 2017
  • November 14, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • November 08, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 07, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 07, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
October, 2017
  • October 27, 2017: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • October 26, 2017: [Discovery]
  • October 25, 2017: [Response]
  • October 19, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 19, 2017: [Request]
  • October 19, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • October 18, 2017: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • October 18, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • October 18, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 18, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • October 18, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 18, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • October 18, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 17, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • October 12, 2017: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • October 12, 2017: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • October 12, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 11, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • October 11, 2017: [Indictment]
  • October 11, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.