U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cr-40089-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ayodele
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 16, 2020: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
December, 2019
  • December 26, 2019: [Letter]
  • December 09, 2019: [Delivered]
October, 2019
  • October 11, 2019: [Transcript - Public]
  • October 11, 2019: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • October 04, 2019: [Transcript - Public]
  • October 04, 2019: [Transcript - Restricted]
June, 2019
  • June 20, 2019: [28:2255 Motion to Vacate (filed in Civil Case)]
August, 2018
  • August 02, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
June, 2018
  • June 19, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 19, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • June 19, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • June 19, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • June 13, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • June 11, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • June 11, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • June 08, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 01, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • June 01, 2018: [Affidavit]
May, 2018
  • May 23, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
April, 2018
  • April 17, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 16, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • April 16, 2018: [Continue]
  • April 16, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • April 16, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • April 16, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • April 02, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
March, 2018
  • March 20, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • March 19, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
January, 2018
  • January 30, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 30, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 29, 2018: [Notice]
  • January 25, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 25, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 25, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 25, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
December, 2017
  • December 18, 2017: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • December 15, 2017: [Discovery]
  • December 05, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • December 04, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • December 04, 2017: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • December 04, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • December 04, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 04, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 04, 2017: [Arraignment]
November, 2017
  • November 29, 2017: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • November 29, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • November 07, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 07, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • November 06, 2017: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • November 06, 2017: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
October, 2017
  • October 11, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • October 11, 2017: [Indictment]
  • October 11, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.