U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-01006
  • Case Name: Heartland State Bank v. Remily et al
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
March, 2019
  • March 06, 2019: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Receipt of Filing Fee]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
  • May 16, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Certificate of Service]
  • May 16, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Judgment]
  • May 16, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Approve Agreement/Stipulation]
April, 2018
  • April 24, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • April 24, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Approve Agreement (incls. an agreement, compromise, settlement or stipulation)]
  • April 05, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Scheduling Order (pre-trial/trial)]
  • April 05, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Hearing Minutes (New)]
March, 2018
  • March 27, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Reschedule Hearing (Text Order)]
February, 2018
  • February 12, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Transcript (Depositions and 2004 Exams Only)]
  • February 08, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Interrogatory Answers]
  • February 05, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Interrogatory Answers]
  • February 01, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Withdraw Document]
  • February 01, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Response]
  • January 31, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Certificate of Service]
  • January 31, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Affidavit]
  • January 31, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Support Document]
  • January 31, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Objection]
  • January 25, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Set Deadlines/Hearing]
  • January 24, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Quash]
  • January 23, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Notice of Intent to Serve Subpoena(s)]
  • January 19, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Set Deadlines/Hearing]
  • January 19, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Extend Time]
  • January 17, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Compel]
  • January 16, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Response]
  • January 03, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Compel]
  • January 03, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Certificate of Service]
  • January 03, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Nonstandard Motion]
  • January 03, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Nonstandard Motion (PRIOR COURT APPROVAL REQUIRED)]
  • January 02, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Request for Production of Documents]
  • January 02, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Interrogatories]
December, 2017
  • December 14, 2017: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Statement of Corporate Ownership]
November, 2017
  • November 16, 2017: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
  • November 13, 2017: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Scheduling Order (pre-trial/trial)]
  • November 10, 2017: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
  • November 01, 2017: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Notice of Intent to Serve Subpoena(s)]
October, 2017
  • October 12, 2017: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Certificate of Service (Summons & Complaint)]
  • October 11, 2017: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • October 11, 2017: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • October 11, 2017: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.