U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-10100
  • Case Name: David Gerald Maag
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 11, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Close Bankruptcy Case Administratively]
February, 2021
  • February 24, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Discharging Trustee Following Dismissal (text order)]
  • February 23, 2021: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Trustee's Final Report Following Dismissal]
December, 2020
  • December 25, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 23, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
November, 2020
  • November 23, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
  • November 01, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Dismissal]
  • October 30, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Dismiss Case]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • May 11, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • May 11, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments]
January, 2020
  • January 02, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
December, 2019
  • December 31, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
  • December 05, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 03, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • December 03, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Substitute Redacted Document (Text Order)]
  • December 03, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • December 03, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Substitute Redacted Document]
  • December 03, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
January, 2019
  • January 25, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 23, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
December, 2018
  • December 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • December 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
August, 2018
  • August 10, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 08, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
  • August 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 03, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Confirmation of Plan]
July, 2018
  • July 19, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Support Document]
  • July 18, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
  • July 18, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Administrative Expense]
  • July 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reminder for Filing Application for Fees]
June, 2018
  • June 14, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 12, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • June 12, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan as Confirmed]
  • June 12, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Confirming Plan - Hrng Held (Text Order) Ch 12/13]
  • June 08, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Proposed Plan as Confirmed]
May, 2018
  • May 30, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Proposed Plan as Confirmed]
  • May 21, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • May 21, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Proposed Plan as Confirmed]
  • May 17, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
April, 2018
  • April 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • April 25, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 24, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 23, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Confirmation Hearing (Ch 12/13)]
  • April 23, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • April 23, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reduced Notice]
  • April 23, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reduced Notice (Shortened Notice)(DO NOT USE re motion to use cash collateral or to obtain credit)]
  • April 23, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • April 18, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reduced Notice (Shortened Notice)(DO NOT USE re motion to use cash collateral or to obtain credit)]
  • April 18, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Modified Plan]
February, 2018
  • February 22, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • February 14, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • February 14, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document]
  • February 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Stipulation]
  • February 02, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • February 02, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
January, 2018
  • January 30, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • January 09, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • January 09, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Confirmation Hearing (Ch 12/13)]
  • January 09, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan/Modified Plan]
November, 2017
  • November 22, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • November 21, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
  • November 16, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Late Notice]
  • November 16, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • November 16, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Amendment to Schedules or Statements with Notice]
  • November 07, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Meeting of Creditors Continued/Rescheduled]
  • November 04, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 02, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • November 02, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employment of Attorney (Text Order)]
October, 2017
  • October 26, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Corrective Entry]
  • October 26, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • October 25, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employment of Attorney]
  • October 25, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Amended Application]
  • October 22, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 20, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing]
  • October 20, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection]
  • October 19, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Debtor(s) Statement Regarding Business Records]
  • October 19, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employee Income Records]
  • October 15, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 14, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 13, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 12]
  • October 12, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • October 12, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Update Deadline(s) Public Event]
  • October 12, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Update Deficiency Deadline(s)]
  • October 12, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice Appointing Trustee]
  • October 12, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employee Income Records]
  • October 12, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 [Employee Income Records]
  • October 12, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employment of Attorney]
  • October 12, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 [Employment of Attorney]
  • October 12, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • October 12, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • October 12, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • October 12, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • October 12, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • October 12, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • October 12, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 12)]
  • October 12, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 12)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.