U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-01027
  • Case Name: Emrit v. Krebs
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2019
  • July 08, 2019: [USCA Mandate]
  • July 08, 2019: [USCA Judgment]
June, 2019
  • June 18, 2019: [USCA Order]
May, 2019
  • May 29, 2019: [USCA Order]
  • May 29, 2019: [USCA Order (Non-Electronic Record)]
  • May 29, 2019: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • May 28, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • May 23, 2019: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • May 23, 2019: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • May 23, 2019: [Notice of Appeal]
March, 2019
  • March 25, 2019: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • March 22, 2019: [Order Dismissing Case]
June, 2018
  • June 04, 2018: [USCA Mandate]
  • June 04, 2018: [USCA Judgment]
May, 2018
  • May 09, 2018: [USCA Order]
April, 2018
  • April 05, 2018: [USCA Order (Non-Electronic Record)]
  • April 05, 2018: [USCA Order]
  • April 05, 2018: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
March, 2018
  • March 27, 2018: [Transmittal of Subsequent Filing to 8th Circuit COA]
  • March 27, 2018: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • March 27, 2018: [Order]
  • March 27, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
February, 2018
  • February 13, 2018: [Notice of Appeal - Interlocutory]
December, 2017
  • December 11, 2017: [Amended Complaint]
  • December 11, 2017: [Notice of Change of Address]
November, 2017
  • November 15, 2017: [Amended Complaint]
October, 2017
  • October 12, 2017: [Letter Sent]
  • October 12, 2017: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • October 12, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 12, 2017: [Complaint (COURT USE ONLY)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.