U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-50130-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Carroll
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • April 21, 2025: [Transfer Out/Supervised Release]
March, 2025
  • March 11, 2025: [Order on Request for Order to Change Victim]
  • March 11, 2025: [Request for Order to Change Victim (COURT USE ONLY)]
March, 2022
  • March 22, 2022: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • March 15, 2022: [Response]
  • March 02, 2022: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • March 01, 2022: [Supplement]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 17, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • February 10, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 03, 2022: [Supplement]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Supplement]
December, 2021
  • December 27, 2021: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
September, 2021
  • September 08, 2021: [Mail Returned]
July, 2021
  • July 13, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
May, 2021
  • May 26, 2021: [USCA Judgment]
  • May 20, 2021: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • May 20, 2021: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • May 19, 2021: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • May 06, 2021: [Order on Motion for Relief under FIRST STEP Act]
April, 2021
  • April 26, 2021: [Supplement]
  • April 26, 2021: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
March, 2021
  • March 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • March 23, 2021: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 23, 2021: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • March 22, 2021: [Seal Existing Document]
  • March 19, 2021: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • March 12, 2021: [Extend]
  • March 05, 2021: [Response]
  • March 05, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 02, 2021: [Redacted Document]
  • March 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • March 01, 2021: [Extend]
February, 2021
  • February 16, 2021: [Supplement]
  • February 03, 2021: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • February 03, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 02, 2021: [Standing Order 20-06 Information - Probation]
  • February 02, 2021: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
January, 2021
  • January 27, 2021: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
September, 2019
  • September 12, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
August, 2019
  • August 13, 2019: [Passport - Return of]
  • August 13, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • August 07, 2019: [Sentencing]
July, 2019
  • July 09, 2019: [Release from Custody]
  • July 02, 2019: [Order]
June, 2019
  • June 12, 2019: [Transcript - Public]
  • June 12, 2019: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • June 06, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • June 06, 2019: [Sentencing]
May, 2019
  • May 23, 2019: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • May 22, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • May 07, 2019: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
March, 2019
  • March 19, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • March 18, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • March 18, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • March 18, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
February, 2019
  • February 25, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • February 21, 2019: [Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • February 05, 2019: [Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • February 01, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
January, 2019
  • January 29, 2019: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • January 29, 2019: [Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • January 18, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
November, 2018
  • November 26, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • November 16, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 16, 2018: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • November 16, 2018: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • November 16, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 14, 2018: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • November 13, 2018: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
October, 2018
  • October 24, 2018: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • October 24, 2018: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • October 23, 2018: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 23, 2018: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • October 22, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • October 22, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • October 22, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
September, 2018
  • September 26, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 18, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 14, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2018
  • July 25, 2018: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • July 24, 2018: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • July 16, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 13, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2018
  • May 08, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 01, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
April, 2018
  • April 23, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 17, 2018: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 17, 2018: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
March, 2018
  • March 06, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 03, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
February, 2018
  • February 23, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2017
  • December 01, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • November 22, 2017: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • November 22, 2017: [Transcript]
  • November 17, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 14, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 06, 2017: [Passport - Receipt of]
October, 2017
  • October 24, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 24, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • October 24, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 24, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • October 24, 2017: [Request]
  • October 24, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 23, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 23, 2017: [Consent]
  • October 23, 2017: [Order of Recusal]
  • October 23, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 23, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 23, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • October 23, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 23, 2017: [Terminate Hearings]
  • October 23, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • October 23, 2017: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • October 18, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • October 16, 2017: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • October 13, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 12, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 12, 2017: [Case Unsealed]
  • October 12, 2017: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.