U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:11-cr-30111-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Kirkie
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 12, 2022: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
January, 2020
  • January 13, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • January 03, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
December, 2019
  • December 10, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
November, 2019
  • November 21, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
  • November 21, 2019: [Text Order of Detention]
  • November 21, 2019: [Text Order Holding Defendant to Answer Revocation Petition]
  • November 21, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • November 21, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 21, 2019: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • November 21, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • November 21, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 18, 2019: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
  • November 18, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
November, 2018
  • November 08, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • November 06, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • November 06, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • October 30, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 26, 2018: [Report and Recommendations]
  • October 26, 2018: [Order]
  • October 26, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • October 26, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 26, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 26, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • October 26, 2018: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • October 26, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 26, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 23, 2018: [Terminate Hearings]
  • October 22, 2018: [Warrant Issued on Revocation]
  • October 22, 2018: [Order for Warrant - Probation Request]
  • October 22, 2018: [Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 22, 2018: [Request for Warrant]
June, 2018
  • June 26, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • June 25, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • June 25, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 19, 2018: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • June 19, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
April, 2018
  • April 25, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 23, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • April 23, 2018: [Report and Recommendations]
  • April 23, 2018: [Order]
  • April 23, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • April 23, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 23, 2018: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • April 20, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • April 18, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • April 18, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 18, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • April 18, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 18, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
November, 2017
  • November 27, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • November 27, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • November 27, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 15, 2017: [Order]
October, 2017
  • October 20, 2017: [Order]
  • October 20, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 19, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • October 19, 2017: [Report and Recommendations]
  • October 19, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 19, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • October 19, 2017: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • October 19, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 19, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 19, 2017: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • October 19, 2017: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • October 18, 2017: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • October 18, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 16, 2017: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • October 13, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 13, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.